BODMIN PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 272984
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £60.70k £77.73k £69.19k £87.52k £121.28k
Total expenditure £72.57k £88.39k £71.86k £89.74k £90.34k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k