THE VICAR'S GENERAL FUND

Charity number: 273004
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £38.34k £52.67k £38.03k £25.68k £74.00k
Total expenditure £72.27k £67.85k £53.98k £65.87k £26.18k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A