Trustees HELP RIZOKARPASSO

Charity number: 273005
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARY KARAOLIS OBE Chair
None on record
Christina Yianni Trustee 10 June 2023
None on record
Maria McVey Trustee 10 June 2023
GREEK LANGUAGE EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT OF HERTFORDSHIRE
Overdue by 354 days
Androulla Nottage Trustee 21 May 2023
None on record
Maria Demetriou Trustee 12 May 2019
None on record
Demetris Nicola Trustee 01 March 2016
None on record
Andreas Gavriel Gavrielides Trustee 30 June 2013
None on record
ANDREAS STRONGOLOU Trustee 01 March 2012
None on record
KATINA CHRISTOFOROU Trustee 28 February 2012
None on record
JOHN CHRONIAS Trustee
None on record
MARIA PANTELI Trustee
None on record