Financial history THE KENT AND SHARPSHOOTERS YEOMANRY REGIMENTAL MUSEUM TRUST

Charity number: 273329
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £9.83k £7.28k £5.12k £7.07k £8.09k
Total expenditure £36.48k £7.89k £5.37k £6.83k £3.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A