THE ST PETER-UPON-CORNHILL TRUST

Charity number: 273392
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £2.03k £1.99k £2.01k £2.09k £2.59k
Total expenditure £1.05k £1.22k £5.19k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A