Financial history A AND G COHN MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 273460
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £19.56k £21.04k £24.95k £22.59k £24.88k
Total expenditure £20.88k £24.33k £21.06k £37.49k £27.79k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A