Financial history CAMBRIDGE MUSLIM WELFARE SOCIETY

Charity number: 273568
Charity reporting is up to date (54 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £105.70k £102.44k £88.26k £110.62k £99.42k
Total expenditure £107.50k £118.52k £97.35k £89.10k £85.62k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A