THE MACAMISH TRUST

Charity number: 273719
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £17.21k £18.52k £18.06k £19.49k £17.48k
Total expenditure £17.69k £24.00k £19.04k £19.98k £28.42k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A