Governing document THE SITTINGBOURNE ORPHEUS CHORAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 274005
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES AS AMENDED ON 8TH FEBRUARY 1977 AND ON 3 FEBRUARY 1987, AND AS AMENDED ON 22 SEPTEMBER 1992 AND 12TH MAY 1998 AND 26 JANUARY 1999 AND 16TH JANUARY 2001. as amended on 13 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
THE COMPREHENSIVE STUDY, PRACTICE AND PERFORMANCE OF CHORAL WORKS IN ORDER TO FOSTER PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF SUCH MUSIC BY MEANS OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCES.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE SITTINGBOURNE AND THE VICINITY
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.