J C EDDY RECTORS HALL

Charity number: 274099
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £3.80k £3.34k £3.72k £3.14k £225
Total expenditure £1.26k £1.83k £2.04k £4.15k £1.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A