Accounts and annual returns CERBERUS SPELAEOLOGICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 274126
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 577 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 577 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 March 2021 148 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 13 May 2020 195 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required