Financial history WORLD GOSPEL MISSION UNITED KINGDOM

Charity number: 274142
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £68.08k £69.87k £87.11k £106.14k £111.65k
Total expenditure £61.68k £69.19k £87.93k £71.32k £66.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £35.84k £15.93k