Trustees FRIENDS OF BRISTOL EYE HOSPITAL
Charity number: 274349
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kay McCluskey | Chair | 13 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Carole Marion Brooke | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Ward | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gail Elizabeth Margery Glew | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin John Phipps | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Fasham Abbey | Trustee | 20 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
James Lee Reddish | Trustee | 13 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Simon St Leger-Harris FIA | Trustee | 09 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER CECILIA WALKER | Trustee | 17 July 1979 |
|
|
||||
DINAH WOOLFORD HARRISON | Trustee | 07 September 1977 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.