Trustees BHARAT HINDU SAMAJ
Charity number: 274404

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jayshreeben Mehta | Trustee | 09 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ekta Patel | Trustee | 09 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rasila Panchal | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rahul Ramechandra | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bina Pankhania | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Manjula Vara | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Nagasayan Puppala | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Harish Patel | Trustee | 14 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
RAJNI REDDY | Trustee | 08 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ravi Kiran Shashu Putta | Trustee | 08 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rajah Kuharajah | Trustee | 08 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Kishor Ladwa | Trustee | 08 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
DR Subhash Kandikattu | Trustee | 08 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Swapnil Gadkari | Trustee | 08 May 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.