Financial history COLLEGE PARK RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 274668
Charity reporting is overdue by 1462 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009
Total gross income £50.82k £29.67k £18.65k £11.51k £8.33k
Total expenditure £53.71k £29.03k £21.42k £10.26k £6.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A