Accounts and annual returns WHADDON RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 274848
Charity reporting is overdue by 83 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 83 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 83 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 January 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 February 2021 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 15 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required