Financial history ASHLEWORTH AND HASFIELD WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 275325
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £5.75k £2.50k £2.52k £1.41k £3.18k
Total expenditure £4.73k £3.12k £2.83k £1.53k £3.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A