THE TORBAY HANDICAPPED COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 275459
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £15.77k £13.15k £15.39k £22.73k £14.61k
Total expenditure £13.59k £17.59k £15.65k £14.19k £16.39k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A