Financial history BOOTSTRAP COMPANY LIMITED

Charity number: 275489
Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.70m £1.81m £1.99m £1.88m £2.16m
Total expenditure £1.71m £1.74m £2.15m £2.30m £2.46m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £17.50k £42.87k £0 £1.41k £4.03k
Income - Other trading activities £286.48k £365.14k £516.71k £420.95k £531.79k
Income - Charitable activities £73.63k £1.40m £1.47m £1.46m £1.62m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.30m £62 £30 £0 £0
Income - Other £21.00k £0 £5.96k £0 £5
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £4.03k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £212.92k £1.42m £1.78m £1.90m £1.97m
Expenditure - Raising funds £223.53k £313.34k £363.37k £396.52k £491.03k
Expenditure - Governance £37.90k £24.32k £31.87k £0 £24.93k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £1.27m £0 £0 £0 £0