Trustees ALTON COMMUNITY CARE
Charity number: 275617
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WILLIAM FORRESTER GRIFFITH GRIFFIN | Chair | 16 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jean-Marc William Olivier | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter Andrew Hinde | Trustee | 26 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Strathern Lapraik | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Gwyneth Rhian Little | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Mary Sinclair | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Sherborne | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Hedd Folkes | Trustee | 15 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Hamilton Marriott | Trustee | 23 June 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.