THE ST MARY'S ASSOCIATION (GERRARD'S CROSS)

Charity number: 275753
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £7.04k £16.31k £8.44k £8.55k £5.45k
Total expenditure £43.79k £3.04k £16.11k £15.73k £1.57k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A