Financial history HARVINGTON SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 275852
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £8.10k £9.49k £14.72k £3.75k £0
Total expenditure £5.46k £4.31k £21.78k £1.35k £1.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A