Accounts and annual returns THE DORSET ARMY CADET LEAGUE

Charity number: 276193
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 28 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 24 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required