HARLYN SURF LIFE SAVING CLUB

Charity number: 276331
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £20.70k £11.64k £17.63k £7.69k £1.84k
Total expenditure £9.24k £21.91k £14.80k £8.00k £3.26k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A