Trustees LEWISHAM TALKING NEWSPAPER
Charity number: 276389
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VALERIE FULCHER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Alastair Fulton | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Hasell | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Garner | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Frederick Drake | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Verna Morris | Trustee | 23 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jack Riley | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|||||
Patricia Elgoute | Trustee | 09 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
BRONWEN COBELL | Trustee | 23 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
GILL BUCHANAN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.