Financial history THE ALBA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 276391
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £17.20k £0 £0 £1.80k £0
Total expenditure £3.25k £5.67k £23.36k £8.39k £3.85k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A