Trustees BRITISH MYCOLOGICAL SOCIETY
Charity number: 276503
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Elaine Bignell | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Linda Seward | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Anthony James Seddon Whalley | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Prof Paul Dyer | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Marcus Yeo | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Daniel Bebber | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mark Ramsdale | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Harries | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Janet Quinn | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr Matthias Brock | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.