THE VICTOR & NAOMI STONE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 276519
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £4.21k £4.39k £4.37k £4.54k £3.27k
Total expenditure £2.06k £1.87k £1.24k £4.43k £4.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A