3RD DUNSTABLE ST PETER'S SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 276542
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £5.30k £7.37k £23.30k £14.40k £18.85k
Total expenditure £4.94k £6.88k £14.51k £11.56k £10.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £11.44k