ST NICOLAS' GUILDFORD - DOROTHY GROVER TRUST

Charity number: 276803
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £78.58k £80.30k £100.01k £93.79k £92.53k
Total expenditure £57.02k £96.65k £47.22k £101.35k £66.14k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A