Accounts and annual returns EAST WORTHING COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 276850
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 24 May 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 24 May 2024 On time
Annual return 31 July 2022 31 May 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 31 May 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 16 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 16 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 24 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 24 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 17 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 17 May 2020 On time Download Open in new window