ST JOHN'S C OF E SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 276956
Charity reporting is overdue by 160 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £17.90k £18.00k £22.18k £18.49k £17.12k
Total expenditure £11.57k £33.51k £19.91k £8.80k £19.02k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A