CMSS

Charity number: 277128
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.17m £1.14m £1.01m £1.02m £1.06m
Total expenditure £1.10m £1.08m £1.01m £1.04m £1.11m
Income from government contracts £854.97k £702.29k £709.22k £708.39k £675.27k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £9.47k £54.62k £620 £6.07k £3.35k
Income - Other trading activities £6.80k £5.94k £4.14k £2.77k £2.19k
Income - Charitable activities £1.13m £1.06m £991.54k £987.09k £960.56k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £25.99k £20.48k £13.82k £15.39k £15.23k
Income - Other £0 £0 £3.50k £6.86k £76.11k
Income - Legacies £0 £50.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.10m £1.08m £1.01m £1.04m £1.11m
Expenditure - Raising funds £743 £1.24k £213 £436 £0
Expenditure - Governance £174.44k £172.95k £174.83k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0