Financial history Walton Voices

Charity number: 277148
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £21.03k £23.98k £32.56k £9.15k £16.12k
Total expenditure £16.09k £23.03k £34.06k £9.11k £19.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.03k N/A N/A N/A N/A