Governing document HARRISON'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CHANCERY SCHEME DATED 6TH MARCH 1899 AND SCHEMES DATED 11TH JULY 1902, 5TH OCTOBER 1909 AND 12TH JULY 1965 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 22 JAN 2019
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE IN NEED OF CHARITABLE RELIEF, INCLUDNG BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO DESCENDANTS OF THE SISTER GRACE HARRISON, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE FOR HIGHER EDUCATION BY THE AWARD OF SCHOLARSHIPS, BURSARIES OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES, AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL BENEFITS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.