J AND A CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 277368
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £3.80k £2.70k £2.83k £3.21k £2.10k
Total expenditure £8.88k £4.09k £8.64k £6.24k £13.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A