HUNTINGDONSHIRE TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 277410
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1 £0 £1 £1 £172
Total expenditure £1.43k £835 £773 £1.16k £773
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A