BRISTOL CHILDREN'S PLAYHOUSE

Charity number: 277462
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £136.25k £163.08k £181.26k £166.83k £209.57k
Total expenditure £132.44k £186.86k £183.29k £184.93k £220.64k
Income from government contracts £0 £155.67k £173.31k N/A £200.00k
Income from government grants £131.02k £0 N/A £158.01k N/A