BARBY CHURCH TRUST

Charity number: 277482
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.80k £3.75k £8.32k £9.13k £4.71k
Total expenditure £6.94k £1.74k £100 £6.00k £16.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A