THE SANSAW AND HARDWICKE CHARITABLE FUND

Charity number: 277526
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £179 £194 £183 £187 £174
Total expenditure £275 £225 £25 £275 £25
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A