Trustees TEACHING STATISTICS TRUST
Charity number: 277531
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NEIL ANTHONY SHELDON | Chair | 08 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr Laura Bonnett | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roger John Edward Porkess | Trustee | 05 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Russell Geach | Trustee | 27 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Darren Macey | Trustee | 19 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr JENNIFER VANESSA FREEMAN | Trustee | 10 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rhys Jones | Trustee | 09 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Helen MacGillivray | Trustee | 20 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Stella Dudzic | Trustee | 08 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
GERALD GOODALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROF N DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.