Governing document THE QUEEN ANNE'S SOCIETY SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20/12/1944 AS AMENDED ON 10/05/1980 AS AMENDED ON 19/01/2008 AS AMENDED ON 22/11/2010 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 11/05/2013 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 22/03/2014
Charitable objects
1TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS AT QUEEN ANNE'S SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF GRANTS; SPECIAL CONSIDERATION BEING GIVEN TO GIRLS IN THE SENIOR SCHOOL (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF FORMER PUPIL AT QUEEN ANNE'S SCHOOL BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.