ST MARY'S BURWELL PRESERVATION TRUST

Charity number: 277633
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £8.39k £6.21k £6.45k £107.97k £9.79k
Total expenditure £3.55k £7.92k £130 £19.59k £2.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A