Financial history W B HARRIS WILL TRUST

Charity number: 277719
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £183.20k £182.27k £182.87k £175.56k £92.87k
Total expenditure £64.79k £57.45k £57.48k £47.62k £52.04k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A