THE R CHRISTOPHER NAYLOR (HARRIET) FUND

Charity number: 277733
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £441 £659 £388 £394 £369
Total expenditure £521 £430 £419 £420 £418
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A