Trustees BRITISH ASSOCIATION FOR PSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY
Charity number: 277825
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor David Stewart Baldwin | Chair | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alexandra Pike | Trustee | 24 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Stephen Dickens | Trustee | 24 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Carmine Pariante | Trustee | 24 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jonathan Peter Rogers | Trustee | 24 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Catherine Harmer | Trustee | 25 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Digby Quested | Trustee | 25 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Steven Marwaha | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sameer Jauhar | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Kevin Charles Francis Fone | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr James Michael Stone | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Susannah Murphy | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Madeleine Victoria King | Trustee | 15 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anthony Christopher Vernon | Trustee | 15 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Rachel Anne Upthegrove | Trustee | 03 November 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.