Governing document The NatWest Group Pensioners Benevolent Fund
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14TH MAY 1979 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 23 MAY 2007. AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 27 MAR 2020 AS AMENDED ON 21 APR 2020 AS AMENDED ON 21 APR 2020 AS AMENDED ON 05 AUG 2020 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 17 JUN 2024
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF AND PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE OF ANY KIND FOR BENEFICIARIES BEING PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES AND IN MAKING GRANTS TO OTHER CHARITABLE BODIES AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) ANY OTHER CHARITABLE BODY THAT EXISTS TO SUPPORT BENEFICIARIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.