BITTON RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 278048
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2021 23 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 25 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 26 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 26 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 17 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required