LONDON SPORTS CLUB FOR THE BLIND

Charity number: 278133
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £10.30k £11.72k £9.59k £5.77k £11.11k
Total expenditure £8.39k £13.94k £8.13k £10.58k £14.27k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A