THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S

Charity number: 278149
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £931 £280 £345 £133 £140
Total expenditure £0 £15.00k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A